+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (110)
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- ALASKA GASLINE DEVELOPMENT CORP. REPORT RECD
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- ALASKA GASLINE DEVELOPMENT CORP. REPORT RECD
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/7/13
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 65
- FN4: (S.FIN/CED)
- FN5: (S.FIN/DOT)
- FN6: (S.FIN/DEC)
- FN7: (S.FIN/DEC)
- FN8: (S.FIN/LAW)
- FN9: (S.FIN/FUND CAP)
- 12:15 PM 5/10/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/21 CHAPTER 11 SLA 13
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/22/13
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- CONCUR MESSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 N4 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 4(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR ADOPTION OF SCS UNAN CONSENT
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N13
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N16
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y4 N16
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y5 N15
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 5 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y8 N12
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 6 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y4 N16
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 7 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y5 N15
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 8 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y5 N15
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y15 N5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSSSHB 4(FIN)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 2NR 1AM SAME TITLE
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, HOFFMAN, FAIRCLOUGH
- NR: BISHOP, OLSON
- AM: DUNLEAVY
- FN4: (S.FIN/CED)
- FN5: (S.FIN/DOT)
- FN6: (S.FIN/DEC)
- FN7: (S.FIN/DEC)
- FN8: (S.FIN/LAW)
- FN9: (S.FIN/FUND CAP)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/12 CALENDAR
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 3DP 1DNP 2NR
- DP: GIESSEL, MCGUIRE, DYSON
- DNP: FRENCH
- NR: MICCICHE, FAIRCLOUGH
- FN2: (H.FIN/VARIOUS DEPTS)
- FN3: (H.FIN/FUND CAP)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, MCGUIRE, GIESSEL, KELLY, DYSON, HUGGINS
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT
- IN FINANCE
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 2NR 2AM
- DP: HOLMES, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, AUSTERMAN
- NR: EDGMON, STOLTZE
- AM: GARA, KAWASAKI
- FN2: (H.FIN/VARIOUS DEPTS)
- FN3: (H.FIN/FUND CAP)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N30 E1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N30 E1
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y9 N30 E1
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y11 N28 E1
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y9 N30 E1
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y9 N30 E1
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y11 N28 E1
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y9 N30 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 4(FIN)
- PASSED Y30 N9 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, NAGEAK, HIGGINS, ISAACSON, LEDOUX, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSSSHB 4(FIN)
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT
- IN FINANCE
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT
- IN FINANCE
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES, T.WILSON
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- CS(RES) NT RECEIVED
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 1NR 2AM
- (CS FORTHCOMING)
- DP: JOHNSON, HAWKER, P.WILSON, SEATON, OLSON, SADDLER
- NR: TUCK
- AM: TARR, FEIGE
- FN1: (REV)
- COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
+ − Amendments (16)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor