+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (60)
On July 10, 2006 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/13/06
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/15 CHAPTER 64 SLA 06
On June 3, 2006 in the House:
- 3:45 PM 6/1/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 2006 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1
On May 7, 2006 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELLIS, DYSON, STEDMAN, THERRIAULT, STEVENS G, DAVIS, WAGONER
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 399(STA)
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 399(STA)
On May 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- NR: OLSON
- FIN RPT SCS(STA) 6DP 1NR
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, BUNDE, HOFFMAN, DYSON, STEDMAN
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: (H.FIN/ADM)
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN4: (H.FIN/ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- DP: THERRIAULT, ELTON, HUGGINS, WAGONER
- STA RPT SCS 4DP SAME TITLE
On April 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 24, 2006 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 399(FIN)
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, GARA, SEATON, GARDNER, ANDERSON
- VERSION: CSHB 399(FIN)
On April 20, 2006 in the House:
- FN4: (H.FIN/ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- NR: HAWKER, WEYHRAUCH, MEYER
- DP: HOLM, KELLY, FOSTER, KERTTULA, STOLTZE, CHENAULT;
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 3NR
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(HSS) RECEIVED
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAPSNER
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
- FN(S) FORTHCOMING
- AM: GARDNER, ELKINS, GATTO
- NR: GRUENBERG;
- DP: LYNN;
- STA RPT 1DP 1NR 3AM
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, ELKINS
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SALMON, GUTTENBERG, WILSON
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS, CROFT, RAMRAS, MOSES, HOLM, MEYER, MCGUIRE
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor