+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/21 CHAPTER 19 SLA 04
On April 8, 2004 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 9:18 AM 4/8/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 5, 2004 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 A3 E1
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- ELTON, ELLIS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, FRENCH,
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 398(JUD)
On March 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- DAVIS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, GUESS, OLSON,
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 398(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2004
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- FRENCH
- DP: SEEKINS, OGAN; NR: THERRIAULT,
- JUD RPT SCS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- AM NO 2 AS AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/23/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y4 N26 E4 A6
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- AM 1 TO AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM 2 TO AM 2 AS AM WITHDRAWN
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y31 E4 A5
- COSPONSOR(S): MASEK, GRUENBERG,
- KOOKESH, HOLM, GARA, STEPOVICH, MEYER,
- CROFT, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 398(JUD) AM
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 398(JUD)AM
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- MCGUIRE
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP
- DP: GARA, SAMUELS, ANDERSON, GRUENBERG,
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor