+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/21 CHAPTER 18 SLA 04
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- 9:50 AM 4/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 7, 2004 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 E3
On April 5, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 397(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 398(JUD)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FRENCH, DYSON,
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- LINCOLN, ELLIS, ELTON
On March 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/31 CALENDAR
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2004
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 4DP SAME TITLE
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, THERRIAULT, OGAN
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/23/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 397(JUD)
- PASSED Y34 E4 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): MASEK, LYNN, MEYER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 397(JUD)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: HOLM, GARA
- DP: SAMUELS, ANDERSON, MCGUIRE;
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 3DP 2NR
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor