+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- PASSED Y38 N1 E1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y28 N9 E1 A2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 395(FIN) AM
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2004
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ROKEBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y37 E1 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 395(FIN) AM
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- FN2: (DNR)
- HARRIS, WILLIAMS; NR: JOULE
- DP: CHENAULT, STOLTZE, FATE, FOSTER,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 1NR
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 19, 2004 in the House:
- FN2: (DNR)
- MASEK
- DP: LYNN, GATTO; NR: WOLF, DAHLSTROM,
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 2DP 3NR
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: (DNR) RECEIVED
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- FN(S): FORTHCOMING
- HOLM; AM: KERTTULA
- DP: KOHRING; NR: ROKEBERG, CRAWFORD,
- O&G RPT CS(O&G) NT 1DP 3NR 1AM
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- O&G, RES, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS