+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On October 21, 1996 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/21/96
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 83 SLA 96
- 10:40 AM 6/11/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 3, 1996 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE ADOPTED Y19 N-
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y11 N9
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 393(HES)
- PASSED Y13 N7
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) Y20 N-
- DONLEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- THIRD READING HELD TO 5/1 CALENDAR
On April 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- THIRD READING 4/30 CALENDAR
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y12 N8
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N12
- HES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/96
On April 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DHSS)
- HES RPT SCS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On April 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 19, 1996 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 18, 1996 in the House:
- THERRIAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y34 N2 E3 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 393(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/96
On April 15, 1996 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 3NR
- DP: FOSTER, HANLEY, MULDER, MARTIN
- DP: PARNELL, KOHRING, GRUSSENDORF
- NR: BROWN, KELLY, THERRIAULT
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 3/27/96
On April 3, 1996 in the House:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 27, 1996 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
- AM: BRICE
- NR: BUNDE, ROBINSON
- DNP: TOOHEY
- DP: G.DAVIS, ROKEBERG
- HES RPT CS(HES) 2DP 1DNP 2NR 1AM
On January 8, 1996 in the House:
- HES, STATE AFFAIRS, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 5, 1996 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor