+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (77)
On May 10, 1994 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- RLS RPT SCS 2CAL 2NR 5/10/94
- ZERO FN TO SCS PUBLISHED (COURT)
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS APPLY (COURT, REV-2)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AMS NO 1 AND 3 WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y8 N12
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y10 N10
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y10 N10
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y15 N5
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 392(RLS)
- RETURN TO 2ND FOR AM 7 FAILED Y10 N10
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On May 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- ZERO FN TO SCS PUBLISHED (CORR)
- FN TO SCS PUBLISHED (COURT)
On May 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- ZERO FN TO SCS PUBLISHED (REV)
- RLS RPT 4CAL 1NR 5/2/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RETURNED TO RULES
On April 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE
On April 19, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FINANCE
On April 18, 1994 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RET 2ND TO RESCIND/AM 6 AM PSD Y 27 N7
- ...E2 A4
- RESCIND ACTION/AM 6 AS AM PSD Y20 N18 E2
- AMENDMENT NO 6 AS AM FAILED Y18 N20 E2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO 2ND FOR AM 7 FLD Y16 N22 E2
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y31 N7 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATES SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 15, 1994 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TECHNICAL AMENDMENT
- AMENDMENT NO 1 BY MARTIN
- AMENDMENT NO 1 FAILED Y13 N21 E4 A2
- AMENDMENT NO 2 BY PARNELL, BROWN
- AMENDMENT NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AMENDMENT NO 3 BY NORDLUND
- AMENDMENT NO 3 FAILED Y8 N25 E4 A3
- AMENDMENT NO 4 BY NORDLUND
- AMENDMENT NO 4 WITHDRAWN
- AMENDMENT NO 5 BY DAVIES
- AMENDMENT NO 5 FAILED Y8 N26 E4 A2
- AMENDMENT NO 6 BY MULDER, KOTT
- AM NO 1 TO AMENDMENT NO 6 BY MULDER
- AM NO 1 TO AM NO 6 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 TO AM NO 6 BY BUNDE/WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 6 AS AMENDED ADOPTED Y23 N11 E4 A2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 392(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y32 N3 E4 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATES SAME AS PASSAGE
- BROWN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
On April 14, 1994 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/94
On April 8, 1994 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 3DP 1DNP 5NR
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, PARNELL
- DNP: MARTIN
- NR: HANLEY, GRUSSENDORF, THERRIAULT
- NR: HOFFMAN, BROWN
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV) 3/4/94
On March 25, 1994 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2NR
- DP: GREEN, KOTT, PORTER, PHILLIPS
- NR: NORDLUND, DAVIDSON
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV) 3/4/94
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) 2DP 3NR
- DP: VEZEY, G.DAVIS
- NR: KOTT, OLBERG, SANDERS
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV) 3/4/94
On January 21, 1994 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS, JUDICIARY, FINANCE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor