+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- 2:00 P.M. 8/4/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/10 CHAPTER 58 SLA 22
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/8/22
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- CONCUR RECEIVED AND HELD
- CONCUR TAKEN UP UC
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 E1 A3
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 392(HSS)
On May 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS SCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 392(HSS)
- PASSED Y15 N- E2 A3
- ENGROSSED
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT SCS(HSS) 1DP 4NR SAME TITLE
- DP: WILSON
- NR: REINBOLD, COSTELLO, BEGICH, HUGHES
- FN1: ZERO(DHS/DOH)
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 392(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y40
- COSPONSOR(S): KURKA, TARR, TILTON, RASMUSSEN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 392(HSS) AM
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(HSS) NEW TITLE 3DP 1NR
- DP: SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
- NR: SCHRAGE
- FN1: ZERO(DHS/DOH)
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) NEW TITLE 4DP
- DP: FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, SNYDER, ZULKOSKY
- FN1: ZERO(DHS/DOH)
- FN2: (CED)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, L&C