+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 15, 2006 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/8 CHAPTER 107 SLA 06
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/9/06
On July 31, 2006 in the House:
- 10:00 AM 7/27/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 389
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 389
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/4 CALENDAR
On April 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- DP: BUNDE, DAVIS, ELLIS, SEEKINS, STEVENS B
- L&C RPT 5DP
On April 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 10, 2006 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- VERSION: HB 389
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 389
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- DP: CRAWFORD, LYNN, LEDOUX, GUTTENBERG, ROKEBERG, KOTT
- L&C RPT 6DP
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- NR: NEUMAN
- DP: COGHILL, LYNN, CRAWFORD, RAMRAS;
- EDT RPT 4DP 1NR
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- EDT, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor