+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/04
- 3:46 PM 6/25/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 111 SLA 04
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N1 A3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 385(JUD)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FRENCH, LINCOLN,
- DAVIS, ELTON, ELLIS
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 385(JUD)
On April 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- DP: SEEKINS, OGAN, FRENCH
- JUD RPT SCS 3DP SAME TITLE
On April 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- HES RPT 3DP
- DP: DYSON, GUESS, DAVIS
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
On April 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, JUD
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 385(JUD)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y36 A4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, DAHLSTROM, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 385(JUD)
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON, HEINZE
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLM
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- GARA, MCGUIRE
- DP: OGG, GRUENBERG, SAMUELS, HOLM,
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 6DP
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor