+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- STA, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 384
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y21 N17 E2
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- TUCK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- FAILED PASSAGE Y20 N17 E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 384
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- SESSION CANCELED 4/25 - ON 4/26 CALENDAR
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- HELD TO 4/25 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/2018
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- NR: ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GRENN
- DNP: WILSON, TILTON, PRUITT
- DP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 4DP 3DNP 3NR 1AM
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: JOSEPHSON, KITO
- DP: WOOL, EDGMON
- L&C RPT 2DP 2NR
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS