+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 15, 1998 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 100 SLA 98
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/14/98
On May 28, 1998 in the House:
- 11:05 AM 5/27/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 5/12 CALENDAR
On May 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 5/11 CALENDAR
On May 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/98
- KELLY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 383(JUD)
- PASSED Y20 N-
On May 7, 1998 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FN (DHSS)
- DP: MILLER; NR: TAYLOR, PARNELL, ELLIS
- JUD RPT 1DP 3NR
On April 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y31 N6 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 383(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/98
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 6DP
- GREEN, PORTER
- DP: BUNDE, BERKOWITZ, JAMES, CROFT,
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.L&C/DHSS) 2/27/98
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.L&C/DHSS)
- SANDERS; NR: COWDERY
- DP: KUBINA, RYAN, HUDSON, ROKEBERG,
- L&C RPT 5DP 1NR
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- L&C, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor