+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 14, 2000 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/11 CHAPTER 37 SLA 00
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 5/12/00
On April 28, 2000 in the House:
- 11:00AM 4/28/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N2
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 4/16/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 382(L&C)
- PASSED Y18 N2
- PARNELL NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- DP: MACKIE, DONLEY, LEMAN, HOFFMAN
- L&C RPT 4DP
On March 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 23, 2000 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y35 N2 E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 382(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/00
On March 17, 2000 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- CISSNA, BRICE, SANDERS, HALCRO
- DP: HARRIS, ROKEBERG; NR: MURKOWSKI,
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 2DP 5NR
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor