+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN2: (DEC)
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- OLSON, WILKEN, WARD; NR: DONLEY
- DP: KELLY, GREEN, AUSTERMAN, HOFFMAN,
- FIN RPT SCS(RES) 7DP 1NR
On May 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: TORGERSON, HALFORD, TAYLOR,
- STEVENS, ELTON; NR: WILKEN
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: (DEC)
On April 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 23, 2002 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 382(FIN)
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT, CRAWFORD
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 382(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 22, 2002 in the House:
- DP: BUNDE, HARRIS, LANCASTER, FOSTER,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP
- CROFT, WILLIAMS
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: (DEC)
On April 19, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- FN2: (DEC)
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- SCALZI; AM: MASEK
- DP: STEVENS, FATE, CHENAULT, KERTTULA,
- RES RPT CS(RES) 5DP 1AM
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS