+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (58)
On May 8, 1998 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/5/98
- 5/7/98 CHAPTER 29, SLA 1998
On May 7, 1998 in the House:
- 2:50 PM 5/7/98 RETURNED TO GOVERNOR
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 5/6/98
- GOVERNOR VETO OVERRIDDEN Y41 N19
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- 8:50 AM 4/21/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PEARCE, TAYLOR, KELLY,
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- TORGERSON, HALFORD, SHARP, DONLEY
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N2 A1
On April 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y14 N4 E1 A1
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On April 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 4/20
On April 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- HALFORD NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y12 N8
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1NR 4/17/98
- PREVIOUS INDETERMINATE FN (DNR)
- NR: PHILLIPS, PARNELL, DONLEY
- DP: SHARP, PEARCE, TORGERSON; DNP: ADAMS
- FIN RPT SCS 3DP 3NR 1DNP SAME TITLE
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 380(FIN)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 3DP 2NR 1AM SAME TITLE
- INDETERMINATE FN (DNR)
- NR: SHARP, GREEN; AM: LINCOLN
- DP: HALFORD, TORGERSON, LEMAN
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- RESOURCES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 7, 1998 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- HODGINS NOTICE OF RECON-WITHDRAWN
- PASSED Y26 N11 E3
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- TITLE AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 380(FIN)
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/98
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/7 CALENDAR
On April 3, 1998 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (DNR) 3/13/98
- AM: GRUSSENDORF
- NR: THERRIAULT, KELLY, MARTIN;
- DP: DAVIS, KOHRING, MULDER;
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 3DP 3NR 1AM
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (DNR)
- KEMPLEN, BUNDE; AM: OGAN
- DP: HODGINS, ROKEBERG, BRICE; NR: RYAN,
- O&G RPT CS(O&G) 3DP 3NR 1AM
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- OIL & GAS, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor