+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 10, 2006 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 59 SLA 06
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On June 3, 2006 in the House:
- 3:45 PM 6/1/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 6, 2006 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
On May 5, 2006 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 380(RES)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 380(RES)
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/4 CALENDAR
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS(RES) 3DP 1NR
- DP: GREEN, BUNDE, DYSON
- NR: HOFFMAN
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
On April 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: WAGONER, STEVENS B, SEEKINS
- NR: ELTON, KOOKESH
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
On March 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On March 20, 2006 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 (TITLE AM) ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 380(FIN)(TITLE AM)
- PASSED Y35 E3 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 380(FIN)(TITLE AM)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 2DP 7NR
- DP: FOSTER, MEYER;
- NR: KERTTULA, STOLTZE, HAWKER, KELLY, WEYHRAUCH, MOSES, CHENAULT
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 7DP
- DP: GATTO, OLSON, ELKINS, LEDOUX, CRAWFORD, SAMUELS, RAMRAS
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN