+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/24/04
- 4:52 PM 7/16/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/26 CHAPTER 167 SLA 04
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 379
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y17 N1 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 379
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2004
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- NR: DYSON, HOFFMAN, BUNDE
- FIN RPT 4DP 3NR
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, OLSON, STEVENS B;
- OLSON, STEDMAN, BUNDE
- FN2: (LWF)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEVENS B, WILKEN,
- ELLIS, ELTON, STEVENS G, GREEN, GUESS,
On May 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN2: (LWF)
- NR: COWDERY
- DP: STEVENS G, STEDMAN, GUESS;
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- DAHLSTROM, OGG, LYNN, GRUENBERG
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, KERTTULA,
- PASSED Y36 E1 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 379
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/04
- VERSION: HB 379
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, JOULE, CROFT, FATE,
- FIN RPT 9DP 2NR
- FN2: (LWF)
- CHENAULT, FOSTER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS;
- NR: STOLTZE, MOSES
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON
- FN1: (LWF)
- GATTO, ROKEBERG, DAHLSTROM, GUTTENBERG
- DP: LYNN, ANDERSON; NR: CRAWFORD,
- L&C RPT 2DP 5NR
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor