+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/20/08
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/22 CHAPTER 37 SLA 08
- 2:48 PM 5/2/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 379
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- THERRIAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y17 N1 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 379
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2008
On April 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: ELLIS, DAVIS, STEVENS
- L&C RPT 3DP
On March 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 379
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): DOOGAN, GARA, HOLMES, KERTTULA, DAHLSTROM
- PASSED Y33 E5 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 379
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/2008
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: GARDNER, LEDOUX, BUCH, NEUMAN, GATTO, OLSON
- L&C RPT 6DP
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS