+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO HOUSE FOR PERMANENT FILING
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM/VARIOUS DEPTS)
- NR: GUESS
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, STEDMAN;
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/9/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y30 E9 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 373
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 373
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM/VARIOUS)
- HOLM, LYNN
- DP: GRUENBERG, WEYHRAUCH; NR: SEATON,
- STA RPT 2DP 3NR
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor