+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 30, 1993 in the House:
- STA RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: ULMER, B.DAVIS, OLBERG, SANDERS
- NR: KOTT, VEZEY
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAA) 3/30/93
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
On March 10, 1993 in the House:
- 2D SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRO- REFERRALS
- STATE AFFAIRS, JUDICIARY
On February 11, 1993 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
- STATE AFFAIRS, JUDICIARY
On January 20, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BRICE
On January 11, 1993 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS, JUDICIARY
On January 8, 1993 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED