+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (61)
On July 25, 2011 in the House:
- REPORT RECEIVED 7/2011
On July 9, 2010 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/27/10
- 1:48 PM 4/21/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/26 CHAPTER 7 SLA 10
On April 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP 1AM NEW TITLE
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS
- AM: OLSON
- FN4: (GOV)
- FN5: (REV)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N11
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, MENARD
- PASSED Y16 N4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 369(FIN)
On April 18, 2010 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- TAKE UP CONCUR
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 369(FIN)
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- DP: MCGUIRE, HUGGINS
- RES RPT SCS 2DP 4NR NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 21
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS, FRENCH, WAGONER
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, HUGGINS, PASKVAN, MEYER, THOMAS
- FN4: (GOV)
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 10DP
- DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, KELLY, AUSTERMAN, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH,
- STOLTZE, HAWKER
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2010
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN3: (GOV)
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 369(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y38 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, PETERSEN, LYNN, NEUMAN, MILLETT, MUNOZ
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 369(FIN) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- DP: OLSON, P.WILSON, JOHNSON, NEUMAN
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 4DP 1NR 1AM
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(GOV)
- NR: SEATON
- AM: KAWASAKI
- FN2: (DOT)
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor