+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (56)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/8/14
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/8/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 72 SLA 14
- 9:55 AM 7/2/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 72 SLA 14
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 N3 E2
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 369(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 369(JUD)
- TAKEN UP IN SECOND READING - AM NO 1 PENDING
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, DYSON, STEVENS, FAIRCLOUGH, MCGUIRE, GARDNER,
- BISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL, STEDMAN, MEYER, ELLIS
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- ENGROSSED
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- AM NO 1 - PENDING
- HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/24 CALENDAR
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/22 - ON 4/23 CALENDAR
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/21 - ON 4/22 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/2014
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: COGHILL, DYSON
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 369(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y32 N3 E4 A1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 369(JUD)
- PASSED Y28 N4 E4 A4
- JOSEPHSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, OLSON
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KITO III
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- AM: LEDOUX
- DP: MILLETT, PRUITT, FOSTER, GRUENBERG, LYNN
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1AM
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, MILLETT, FOSTER
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor