+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD SCS RECEIVED SAME TITLE
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS FORTHCOMING 2DP 2NR
- NR: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT;
- DP: OGAN, FRENCH
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: ZERO(CED)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD, FIN
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/04
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 AS AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y6 N33 E1
- AM NO 5 NOT OFFERED
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 367(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y36 N2 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 367(FIN) AM
On April 19, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 3DP 6NR
- DP: MEYER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS;
- NR: HAWKER, STOLTZE, MOSES, CHENAULT,
- FATE, FOSTER
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: (CED)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 3DP 3NR
- DP: ANDERSON, GARA, MCGUIRE;
- NR: SAMUELS, GRUENBERG, OGG
- FN1: (CED)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 2DP 3NR 2AM
- DP: DAHLSTROM, ANDERSON; NR: CRAWFORD,
- LYNN, GATTO; AM: ROKEBERG, GUTTENBERG
- FN1: (CED)
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/9/04)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD, FIN