+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- MOTION TO DISCHARGE FROM JUDICIARY FAILED Y5 N15
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
On April 6, 2008 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y23 N16 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y24 N15 E1
- COURT RULE(S) FAILED Y24 N15 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 364(FIN)(EFD FLD)(CT RULE FLD)
On April 5, 2008 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 364(FIN)
- PASSED Y23 N15 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y29 N9 E1 A1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS EFFECTIVE DATE
- MOTION TO RESCIND ACTION ON CT RULES WITHDRAWN
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 4, 2008 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/5 CALENDAR
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 3DP 1DNP 3NR
- DP: KELLY, STOLTZE, MEYER
- DNP: JOULE
- NR: HAWKER, THOMAS, HARRIS
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(HSS)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(CRT)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 4DP 2DNP 1AM
- DP: LYNN, COGHILL, DAHLSTROM, RAMRAS
- DNP: GRUENBERG, HOLMES
- AM: SAMUELS
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(HSS)
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY, GATTO
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, NEUMAN, ROSES
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor