+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: WOOL, TILTON
- DP: NAGEAK, TALERICO, CLAMAN, COLVER, VAZQUEZ
- ENE RPT 5DP 2NR
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HERRON
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- ENE, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS