+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEBON, NELSON, KAUFMAN
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, GILLHAM, MCKAY, TILTON, SHAW, CARPENTER
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor