+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 14, 1998 in the House:
- CONCUR NOT TRANSMITTED BEFORE SINE DIE
On May 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N1
On May 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y14 N5 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 361(TRA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/98
On May 1, 1998 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT SCS 2DP 1NR 1AM SAME TITLE
- (H) ZERO FN (DOT)
- DP: HALFORD, GREEN; AM: LINCOLN
- NR: WILKEN
On April 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- TRANSPORTATION
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y33 N6 A1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING PASSED Y37 N3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 361(TRA) AM
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y30 N9 A1
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DOT)
- NR: ELTON, KOOKESH, SANDERS
- DP: HUDSON, COWDERY, MASEK, WILLIAMS;
- TRA RPT CS(TRA) 4DP 3NR
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- TRANSPORTATION
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor