+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/8/13
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/9 CHAPTER 5 SLA 13
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- 11:15 AM 3/26/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 36
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- MEYER, KELLY, MICCICHE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, DYSON, BISHOP, COGHILL, EGAN, GIESSEL, STEDMAN,
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 36
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- DP: GIESSEL, MICCICHE, BISHOP, MCGUIRE, DYSON
- RES RPT 5DP
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y35 E4 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 36
- VERSION: HB 36
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/1/2013
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/4 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, GARA, LYNN
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- NR: TUCK, TARR
- DP: JOHNSON, HAWKER, P.WILSON, OLSON, SEATON, FEIGE, SADDLER
- RES RPT 7DP 2NR
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor