+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 21, 2002 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/19 CHAPTER 64 SLA 02
- 1:50 PM 6/11/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 358(CRA)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TAYLOR
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 358(CRA)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.CRA)
- NR: ELTON
- DP: TORGERSON, TAYLOR, STEVENS, WILKEN;
- RES RPT 4DP 1NR
On April 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 3DP
- DP: TORGERSON, PHILLIPS, AUSTERMAN
- FN1: ZERO(H.CRA)
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, RES
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 358(CRA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/27/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y37 E1 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 358(CRA)
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.CRA)
- KERTTULA, MEYER, MORGAN
- DP: MURKOWSKI, HALCRO, SCALZI, GUESS,
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) NT 7DP
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS