+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- FN2: (H.FIN/CED)
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 284
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y12 N27 E1
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 358(FIN)
- PASSED Y36 N3 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, JOHNSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 358(FIN)
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON
- FN2: (H.FIN/CED)
- NR: GUTTENBERG, NEUMAN
- DP: GARA, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, FAIRCLOUGH, EDGMON, JOULE, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 2NR
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(CED)
- DP: CHENAULT, THOMPSON, SADDLER, JOHNSON, HOLMES, MILLER, OLSON
- L&C RPT 7DP
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor