+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (55)
On May 12, 2006 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/9 CHAPTER 25 SLA 06
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/10/06
On May 5, 2006 in the House:
- 4:20 PM 5/5/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 357(FIN)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILKEN, GUESS, STEVENS G, BUNDE, ELLIS, ELTON, SEEKINS,
- WAGONER, FRENCH, DAVIS, DYSON
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 357(FIN)
On May 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADOPTED HOUSE LETTER OF INTENT UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/2 CALENDAR
On April 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 7DP
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, BUNDE, OLSON, DYSON, STEDMAN, HOFFMAN
- HOUSE LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
On March 17, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ELKINS
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- HES RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: DYSON, WILKEN
- NR: ELTON, OLSON
- HOUSE LETTER OF INTENT WITH HES REPORT
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, FIN
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/22/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 357(FIN)
- PASSED Y36 N1 E2 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ADOPTED FIN LETTER OF INTENT UC
- COSPONSOR(S): SEATON, CROFT, MCGUIRE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 357(FIN)
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: STOLTZE, KERTTULA, HAWKER, FOSTER, MEYER;
- NR: HOLM, KELLY;
- AM: WEYHRAUCH
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, ROKEBERG
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(HES) 4DP 1NR
- DP: CISSNA, GARDNER, SEATON, WILSON;
- NR: KOHRING
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, FIN
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor