+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/21 CHAPTER 17 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/22/04
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- 1:46 PM 4/19/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- TAKE UP CONCUR WITHDRAWN
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y28 E5 A7
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 357(JUD)
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 357(JUD)
On April 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS(JUD) 7DP
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, DYSON, HOFFMAN,
- OLSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 4DP SAME TITLE
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, THERRIAULT, OGAN
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 357(JUD)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT, MASEK, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 357(JUD)
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) 10DP
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE, JOULE,
- CROFT, MOSES, FATE, FOSTER, HARRIS,
- WILLIAMS
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 1NR
- DP: SAMUELS, GARA, MCGUIRE; NR: HOLM
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/2/04)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor