+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/26/14
- 12:52 PM 7/23/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/28 CHAPTER 101 SLA 14
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 357
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 357
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/2014
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 1DP 2NR
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: DUNLEAVY
- NR: OLSON, MICCICHE
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 357
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- VERSION: HB 357
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y34 E3 A3
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: REINBOLD
- DP: CHENAULT, JOSEPHSON, SADDLER, OLSON
- L&C RPT 4DP 1NR
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS