+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/4 CHAPTER 28 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/04
On April 26, 2004 in the House:
- 3:14 PM 4/26/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 356
On April 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 356
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- STEVENS B NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/19 CALENDAR
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 1DP 4NR
- NR: BUNDE, SEEKINS, DAVIS, STEVENS G;
- DP: FRENCH
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
On March 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/19/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 356
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 356
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- L&C RPT 4DP
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, DAHLSTROM, ANDERSON
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/2/04)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C