+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On October 21, 1996 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/19/96
- MANIFEST ERROR
- 8:10 PM 6/04/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 65 SLA 96
On May 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y19 N1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DUNCAN, LINCOLN,
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ 3RD TIME CSHB 354(FIN) AM S
- DONLEY, ELLIS, KELLY, HOFFMAN
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On May 7, 1996 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N2 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): IVAN, ROBINSON, ELTON
- COSPONSOR(S): OGAN
On May 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR & 1 OTHER 5/6/96
- HELD TO 5/7/96 CALENDAR
On May 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- ZHAROFF, SALO, GREEN
- CROSS SPONSOR: HALFORD, TAYLOR, PEARCE
- PREVIOUS H FN (ADM)
- FIN RPT 2DP 5NR
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 16, 1996 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- TITLE AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y34 N4 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): NICHOLIA
On April 15, 1996 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KUBINA, G.DAVIS
- BARNES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y35 N4 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 354(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N22 E1 A2
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/96
On April 12, 1996 in the House:
- DP: MULDER, GRUSSENDORF, PARNELL, BROWN
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 4NR
- FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 2/16/96
- DP: FOSTER
- NR: MARTIN, THERRIAULT, KOHRING, HANLEY
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 2/16/96
- DP: JAMES, PORTER, ROBINSON, OGAN
- STA RPT CS(STA) 4DP
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- NR: BUNDE, TOOHEY
- DP: G.DAVIS, ROBINSON, BRICE
- HES RPT 3DP 2NR
On January 8, 1996 in the House:
- HES, STATE AFFAIRS, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On December 29, 1995 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor