+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- FIN RPT 3DP 2NR 2AM
- DP: STOLTZE, KELLY, MEYER
- NR: HAWKER, THOMAS
- AM: GARA, CHENAULT
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 2DP 2DNP 2NR 1AM
- DP: COGHILL, LYNN
- DNP: JOHANSEN, DOLL
- NR: JOHNSON, ROSES
- AM: GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTO
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN