+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- 3:46 PM 6/25/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/28 CHAPTER 104 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/26/04
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 353(JUD)
- PASSED Y11 N9
- COURT RULE(S) ADOPTED Y17 N3
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 353(JUD)
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- HES RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: DYSON, GUESS, DAVIS;
- NR: WILKEN
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(EED)
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 1DP 2NR
- NR: STEVENS G, STEDMAN; DP: GUESS
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(EED)
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, HES
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/21/04
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 353(JUD)
- PASSED Y34 N3 A3
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, GARA, KOOKESH
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 353(JUD)
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1NR
- DP: SAMUELS, GARA, GRUENBERG, OGG,
- MCGUIRE; NR: HOLM
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(EED)
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(HES) 4DP 2NR
- DP: KAPSNER, GATTO, CISSNA, WILSON;
- NR: COGHILL, WOLF
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(EED)
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- EDU RPT 3DP 2NR 2AM
- DP: GARA, KAPSNER, GATTO;
- NR: OGG, WOLF; AM: SEATON, WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(EED)
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/2/04)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDU, HES, JUD