+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (117)
On July 15, 1994 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/27 CHAPTER 67 SLA 94
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 8, 1994 in the House:
- 10:00 AM 5/8/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 1994 in the House:
- CONCUR IN (S) AM Y34 N6
- EFFECTIVE DATES SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 6, 1994 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 5, 1994 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y17 N3
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ THE 3RD TIME SCS CSHB 351(STA)AM S
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 6 Y12 N8
- AM NO 6 ADOPTED Y12 N8
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y16 N4
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- RLS RPT 3CAL 1NR 5/3/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, TAYLOR,
- LEMAN, MILLER, SHARP
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y11 N9
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N11
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y10 N10
- AM NO 4 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y7 N13
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y11 N9
- THIRD READING 5/4 CALENDAR
On May 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 3DP 2NR (STA)SCS
- FISCAL NOTE TO STA SCS PUBLISHED (DPS)
- PREVIOUS H FN APPLIES TO SCS (GOV)
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN APPLIES TO SCS (LAW)
On April 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- STA RPT SCS 3DP SAME TITLE
- PREVIOUS H FNS APPLY (GOV, DPS)
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN APPLIES (LAW)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS, FINANCE
On April 19, 1994 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y33 N4 E1 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 18, 1994 in the House:
- READ 3RD TIME CSHB 351(FIN) AM(EFD ADD)
- PASSED Y31 N7 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- FINKELSTEIN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 15, 1994 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AMENDMENT NO 1 BY SITTON
- AMENDMENT NO 1 FAILED Y9 N23 E3 A5
- AMENDMENT NO 2 BY BROWN
- AMENDMENT NO 2 FAILED Y13 N24 E3
- AMENDMENT NO 3 BY SITTON
- AMENDMENT NO 3 FAILED Y13 N24 E3
- AMENDMENT NO 4 BY PORTER
- AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT NO 4 BY PORTER
- AM TO AM NO 4 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 4 AS AMENDED ADOPTED Y24 N13 E3
- AMENDMENT NO 5 BY BRICE
- AM TO AMENDMENT NO 5 BY BRICE
- AM TO AM NO 5 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 AS AMENDED FAILED Y12 N25 E3
- AMENDMENT NO 6 BY DAVIES
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AMENDMENT NO 6 FAILED Y13 N23 E4
- AMENDMENT NO 7 BY DAVIES
- AMENDMENT NO 7 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AMENDMENT NO 8 BY DAVIES
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AMENDMENT N9 8 FAILED Y7 N29 E4
- AMENDMENT NO 9 BY DAVIES
- AMENDMENT NO 9 FAILED Y10 N26 E4
- AMENDMENT NOS 10 AND 11 NOT OFFERED
- AMENDMENT NO 12 BY NORDLUND
- AMENDMENT NO 12 FAILED Y7 N29 E4
- AMENDMENT NO 13 BY MACLEAN
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AMENDMENT NO 13 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AMENDMENT NO 14 BY DAVIES
- AMENDMENT NO 14 FAILED Y10 N26 E4
- AMENDMENT NO 15 BY NICHOLIA
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AMENDMENT NO 15 FAILED Y15 N21 E4
- AMENDMENT NO 16 BY VEZEY
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AMENDMENT NO 16 FAILED Y13 N23 E4
- AMENDMENT NO 17 NOT OFFERED
- AMENDMENT NO 18 BY FINKELSTEIN
- AM TO AM NO 18 BY MACKIE/WITHDRAWN
- AMENDMENT NO 18 FAILED Y7 N29 E4
- AMENDMENT NO 19 BY BRICE
- AMENDMENT NO 19 FAILED Y10 N26 E4
- OBJECTION TO ADVANCEMENT MOTION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/18 CALENDAR
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 6DP 1DNP 3NR
- DP: MARTIN, HANLEY, PARNELL
- DP: GRUSSENDORF, THERRIAULT, FOSTER
- DNP: MACLEAN
- NR: LARSON, NAVARRE, BROWN
- -FISCAL NOTE (GOV) 4/12/94
- -PREVIOUS FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 3/25/94
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAW) 3/25/94
On March 25, 1994 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NEW TITLE 3DP 4NR
- DP: PHILLIPS, KOTT, JAMES
- NR: NORDLUND, DAVIDSON, GREEN, PORTER
- -FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 3/25/94
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAW) 3/25/94
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NEW TITLE 5DP 1NR
- DP: VEZEY,KOTT,G.DAVIS,OLBERG,SANDERS
- NR: ULMER
- -FISCAL NOTE (H.STA FOR DPS) 3/2/94
On January 12, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SANDERS
On January 10, 1994 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS, JUDICIARY, FINANCE
On January 7, 1994 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor