+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 22, 2008 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/14/08
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 91 SLA 08
On June 6, 2008 in the House:
- 2:46 PM 6/5/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FRENCH, GREEN, BUNDE, THERRIAULT, STEVENS, DYSON, WAGONER,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2008
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 351(JUD)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- THOMAS, HUGGINS, WIELECHOWSKI, ELLIS, MCGUIRE, ELTON
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 351(JUD)
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- DP: MCGUIRE, FRENCH, STEVENS, GREEN, BUNDE
- STA RPT 5DP
On March 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 351(JUD)
- PASSED Y34 E5 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, LEDOUX, ROSES
- VERSION: CSHB 351(JUD)
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- CHENAULT
- DP: HAWKER, CRAWFORD, JOULE, GARA, NELSON, STOLTZE, THOMAS, KELLY, MEYER,
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) 10DP
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- DP: DOOGAN, LYNN, COGHILL, DAHLSTROM, SAMUELS, HOLMES, RAMRAS
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 7DP
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor