+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, MEYER, HUGGINS, STEVENS, WAGONER, MENARD
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, DYSON
On April 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES
- HSS, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- COURT RULE(S) FAILED Y22 N14 E4
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 35(FIN)
- PASSED Y22 N14 E4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y23 N13 E4
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 35(FIN)(CT RULE FLD)(EFD FLD)
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/2 CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2009
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- DP: R.FOSTER, KELLY, STOLTZE
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 3DP 4NR 4AM
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
- NR: THOMAS, JOULE, AUSTERMAN, HAWKER
- AM: GARA, SALMON, CRAWFORD, FAIRCLOUGH
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DNP: GRUENBERG, HOLMES
- DP: LYNN, COGHILL, GATTO, DAHLSTROM, RAMRAS
- JUD RPT 5DP 2DNP
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, KELLY, HARRIS, LYNN, P.WILSON, RAMRAS, GATTO
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor