+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 19, 2015 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/18 CHAPTER 2 SLA 15
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/17/15
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- 9:35 AM 4/3/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 5DP
- DP: STOLTZE, HUGGINS, MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 35(STA)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MACKINNON, STOLTZE, GIESSEL, DUNLEAVY, KELLY
- PASSED Y19 N- 1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 35(STA)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELLIS, MCGUIRE, COSTELLO, OLSON, COGHILL, STEVENS, MICCICHE
- BISHOP, EGAN, STEDMAN
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/20/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 35(STA)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, TILTON, PRUITT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 35(STA)
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, SADDLER, TUCK
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, WOOL, STUTES, TARR
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, KELLER, LEDOUX, GRUENBERG, JOSEPHSON, THOMPSON, TALERICO,
- CHENAULT, HERRON, MUNOZ, JOHNSON, COLVER
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 6DP
- DP: TALERICO, STUTES, KELLER, GRUENBERG, KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTIS
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/15
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor