+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 13, 2007 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/12/07
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/11 CHAPTER 12 SLA 07
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- 3:12 PM 4/26/07 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 35
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/2007
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 35
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- FN2: (H.FIN/CED)
- NR: OLSON
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, ELTON, THOMAS, DYSON, HUGGINS
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAVIS
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 16, 2007 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 35
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
- SAMUELS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 35
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/2007
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- DP: GARA, THOMAS, JOULE, CRAWFORD, NELSON, FOSTER, MEYER, CHENAULT
- FIN RPT 8DP 1NR
- FN2: (H.FIN/CED)
- NR: STOLTZE
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, NELSON
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: GARDNER, LEDOUX, BUCH, NEUMAN, GATTO, RAMRAS, OLSON
- L&C RPT 7DP
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BUCH
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/5/07