+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On April 3, 1996 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 29, 1996 in the House:
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DHSS, DPS) 3/13/96
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DOE, LAW)
- NR: BUNDE
- DP: G.DAVIS, ROKEBERG, TOOHEY, ROBINSON
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 4DP 1NR
On March 13, 1996 in the House:
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DHSS, DPS)
- NR: GREEN, IVAN
- DP: JAMES, PORTER, ROBINSON
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 3DP 2NR
On January 8, 1996 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY, TOOHEY
On May 13, 1995 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS, HES, JUD, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)