+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/21 CHAPTER 15 SLA 04
On April 7, 2004 in the House:
- 9:44 AM 4/7/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 348(JUD)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FRENCH, ELLIS
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On March 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 348(JUD)
- ADOPTED HOUSE LETTER OF INTENT UC
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: ZERO(H.JUD)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT, OGAN, FRENCH
- HOUSE LETTER OF INTENT WITH JUD REPORT
- JUD RPT 4DP
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- CROFT, MEYER
- COSPONSOR(S): MASEK, HARRIS, LYNN,
- ADOPTED JUD LETTER OF INTENT UC
- PASSED Y34 E4 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 348(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/23/2004
- VERSION: CSHB 348(JUD)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH JUD REPORT
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP
- DP: GARA, SAMUELS, ANDERSON,
- GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(H.JUD)
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/2/04)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor