+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 347(JUD) AM
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/11
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 347(JUD) AM
- RETURN TO 2ND FOR AM 2 FLD Y12 N26 E1 A1
- PASSED Y22 N17 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y30 N9 E1
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 6, 2012 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y20 N16 E4
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 4DP 2NR
- DP: LYNN, KELLER, PRUITT, THOMPSON
- NR: GRUENBERG, HOLMES
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- STA RPT 3DP 2DNP 1NR
- DP: JOHANSEN, KELLER, LYNN
- DNP: PETERSEN, SEATON
- NR: P.WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor