+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 15, 1998 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/21/98
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/23 CHAPTER 123 SLA 98
- MANIFEST ERROR
- 10:20 AM 6/5/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 1998 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILKEN
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 347(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1NR 5/7/98
On May 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FN (LABOR)
- DP: LEMAN; NR: MACKIE, KELLY
- L&C RPT 1DP 2NR
On May 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On May 4, 1998 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y27 N12 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 347(L&C)
On May 2, 1998 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/4 CALENDAR
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/98
On April 30, 1998 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LABOR)
- NR: KUBINA, RYAN
- DP: COWDERY, SANDERS, HUDSON, ROKEBERG;
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 4DP 2NR
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor