+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- RULES TO 3RD SUP CALENDAR 4/15/12
- HELD ON SECRETARY'S DESK
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 5DP
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, GIESSEL, MEYER
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER, MENARD, PASKVAN, ELLIS, DAVIS, THOMAS
On April 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 345
- PASSED Y40
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, JOHNSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 345
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- STA RPT 7DP
- DP: JOHANSEN, P.WILSON, KELLER, GRUENBERG, SEATON, PETERSEN, LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- TRA RPT 3DP 2NR
- DP: PETERSEN, GRUENBERG, P.WILSON
- NR: JOHNSON, PRUITT
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, STA
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor