+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (56)
On July 15, 1994 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/11/94
- 11:45 AM 5/18/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/10 CHAPTER 109 SLA 94
On May 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PEARCE, TAYLOR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 342(FIN)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/94
- PASSED Y18 N2
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On May 10, 1994 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 N2 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN APPLIES (DCED)
- FIN RPT SCS 3DP 4NR SAME TITLE
On May 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FINANCE
On April 29, 1994 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AMENDMENT NO 1 BY KOTT, ULMER, HUDSON
- AMENDMENT NO 1 ADOPTED Y27 N9 E2 A2
- AMENDMENT NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- AMENDMENT NO 3 BY HUDSON, KOTT, ULMER
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AMENDMENT NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 342(FIN) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- TECHNICAL TITLE AMENDMENT BY PHILLIPS
- TECH TITLE AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y36 N- E2 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- BROWN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N- E2 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 7DP 2NR 2AM
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, GRUSSENDORF
- DP: HOFFMAN, BROWN, FOSTER, NAVARRE
- NR: HANLEY, MARTIN
- AM: PARNELL, THERRIAULT
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 1/21
On April 5, 1994 in the House:
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 1/21
- NR: VEZEY, OLBERG
- DP: KOTT, G.DAVIS, B.DAVIS, ULMER
- STA RPT 4DP 2NR
On January 21, 1994 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 1/21/94
- DP: PORTER, GREEN
- DP: MACKIE, HUDSON, WILLIAMS, SITTON,
- L&C RPT 6DP
On January 10, 1994 in the House:
- L&C, STATE AFFAIRS, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 3, 1994 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED