+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (70)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- 3:46 PM 6/25/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 126 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 342(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 342(FIN) AM
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: WILKEN, DYSON, STEVENS B, BUNDE;
- NR: OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(COR)
- FN6: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN7: (ADM)
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 1DP 1NR 2AM
- DP: SEEKINS, NR: THERRIAULT;
- AM: OGAN, FRENCH
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(COR)
- FN6: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
On May 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
On May 1, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 342(FIN) AM
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- PASSED Y38 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG, WILSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 342(FIN) AM
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y16 N21 E1 A2
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y19 N19 E2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 2DP 3NR 5AM
- DP: FOSTER, WILLIAMS; NR: JOULE, FATE,
- HARRIS; AM: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE,
- CROFT, CHENAULT
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(COR)
- FN6: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 3DP 4NR
- DP: ANDERSON, GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE;
- NR: HOLM, GARA, SAMUELS, OGG
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(COR)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/2/04)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD