+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: KAUFMAN, MYERS
- NR: TOBIN, WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On March 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 341
- PASSED Y40
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 341
On March 11, 2024 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/2024
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING NEXT CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- TRA RPT 7DP
- DP: MINA, STUTES, MCKAY, VANCE, SUMNER, C.JOHNSON, MCCABE
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On February 20, 2024 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor